House
|
06/15/2022
|
Effective date: 08/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 450.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 24 yeas and 8 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 68, nays 28. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Smith, Luneau, and Henry.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Marcelle, Gaines, and Muscarello.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 49, nays 45, the House refused to concur in the amendments proposed by the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 5 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Reported with amendments (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|