House
|
06/05/2022
|
By a vote of 102 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/24/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|