Senate | 03/29/2022 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 58, nays 23. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/24/2022. | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Reported favorably (8-3-1). | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Prefiled. |