LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB241
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB241
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2022 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB241
Action History
House
05/02/2022
Becomes HB 1067.
House
04/28/2022
Reported by substitute (12-0).
House
03/14/2022
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
House
03/04/2022
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
House
02/28/2022
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
House
02/28/2022
Prefiled.