House
|
06/05/2022
|
By a vote of 40 yeas, 60 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/28/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/24/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Reported favorably (12-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|