House
|
06/15/2022
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 454.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Jackson, Fesi, and Stine.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Magee, Harris, and Orgeron.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported favorably (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|