Senate | 03/22/2022 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/21/2022. | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Reported favorably (10-0-1). | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Prefiled. |