House | 05/24/2022 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/23/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2022. | ||
House | 05/23/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/23/2022 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 05/23/2022 | Reported favorably (7-4). | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Prefiled. |