Senate | 04/11/2022 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/06/2022. | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Reported favorably (15-0). | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Prefiled. |