Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 29. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Reported without amendments (13-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Reported favorably (8-4. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|