House
|
06/05/2022
|
By a vote of 78 yeas, 16 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 27. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Reported with amendments (10-3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|