Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 18. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Reported with amendments (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported with amendments (8-3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|