House | 06/01/2022 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/31/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022. | ||
House | 05/31/2022 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/31/2022 | Discharged from the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/31/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/26/2022 | Reported favorably (13-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/18/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 05/17/2022 | Reported favorably (9-4. To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Prefiled. |