House | 04/12/2022 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/2022. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Reported with amendments (10-0). | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/11/2022. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Prefiled. |