House
|
06/16/2022
|
Effective date: 08/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 481.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, Carter, and Robert Mills.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Boyd, Gregory Miller, and Mike Johnson.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/19/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported with amendments (13-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|