House
|
05/17/2022
|
Effective date: 08/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 22.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/11/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|