Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 58, nays 37. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|