House
|
06/02/2022
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Becomes Act No. 172.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Read by title, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported without amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Reported with amendments (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|