House
|
06/05/2022
|
By a vote of 76 yeas, 23 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|