House
|
06/17/2022
|
Effective date: 01/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 554.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 2 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Talbot, White, and Henry.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Huval, Illg, and Firment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Reported with amendments (18-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported favorably (10-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|