House
|
06/16/2022
|
Effective date: 08/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 487.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Reported with amendments (7-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
By a vote of 45 yeas, 22 nays, House Bill 648 was discharged from the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice and recommitted to the Committee Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|