House | 05/23/2022 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/23/2022 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/19/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2022. | ||
House | 05/19/2022 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/16/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2022. | ||
House | 05/11/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. | ||
House | 05/10/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2022. | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2022. | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Prefiled. |