House
|
06/20/2022
|
Effective date: 08/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 738.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|