House
|
06/18/2022
|
Effective date: 08/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 632.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/2/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|