House | 05/09/2022 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 41, nays 49. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/09/2022 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/09/2022 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2022. | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Reported with amendments (9-3-1). | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Prefiled. |