House | 05/09/2022 | Becomes HB 1077. | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | Reported by substitute (12-0). | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | By a vote of 47 yeas, 35 nays, House Bill 744 was discharged from the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice and recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Prefiled. |