Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|