Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Reported favorably (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|