House
|
06/18/2022
|
Effective date: 06/18/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 717.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/2/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2022
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported with amendments (13-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|