Senate | 05/12/2022 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2022 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/10/2022 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 22. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2022. | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Reported with amendments (18-0). | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |