Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Reported favorably (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/18/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|