LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB913
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB913
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2022 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB913
Action History
House
05/12/2022
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 42, nays 54. Failed to pass.
House
05/05/2022
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2022.
House
05/04/2022
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
05/03/2022
Reported favorably (8-0).
House
04/05/2022
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
House
04/04/2022
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.