House
|
06/16/2022
|
Effective date: 08/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 521.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Selders, Harris, and Freiberg.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Jackson, Foil, and Talbot.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 69, nays 27, the House refused to concur in the amendments proposed by the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 16. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 28. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|