Senate | 04/28/2022 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2022. | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |