Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported favorably (8-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|