House
|
06/18/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|