House
|
06/05/2022
|
By a vote of 94 yeas, 5 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|