Senate | 05/17/2022 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/16/2022 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 87, nays 4. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/12/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. | ||
House | 05/11/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/10/2022 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 05/04/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |