House | 06/01/2022 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/19/2022. | ||
House | 05/19/2022 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/17/2022 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/16/2022 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |