Senate | 06/03/2022 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2022 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 06/02/2022 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 90, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 06/01/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2022. | ||
House | 06/01/2022 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/31/2022 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 05/25/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/24/2022 | Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/23/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/19/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |