House
|
06/03/2022
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported with amendments (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|