House
|
05/10/2022
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported favorably (13-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|