Senate | 05/24/2022 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2022 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/19/2022 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 91, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/17/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2022. | ||
House | 05/12/2022 | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/11/2022 | Reported with amendments (15-0). | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |