House | 05/11/2022 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 23, nays 65. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/11/2022 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2022. | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2022. | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2022. | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2022. | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Reported favorably (6-5). | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |