House
|
06/01/2022
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/19/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported favorably (8-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|