Senate | 05/24/2022 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2022 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/19/2022 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/17/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2022. | ||
House | 05/17/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/16/2022 | Reported favorably (12-0). | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |