House
|
06/08/2022
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 100, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 8 for 04/21/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported favorably (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|