Senate | 05/18/2022 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/16/2022 | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 63, nays 31. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/16/2022 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/16/2022 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/04/2022 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |