House
|
06/01/2022
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/26/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 89, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|