House | 06/08/2022 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/06/2022 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/06/2022 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 06/03/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. | ||
House | 06/01/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/31/2022 | Reported favorably (9-0). | ||
House | 05/25/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 05/24/2022 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |